Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benito María de Moxó y Francolí, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1763Born
20 Jun 180340.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Michoacán, México
20 Jun 180340.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
1 May 180441.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
26 Jun 180542.2AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
11 Apr 181652.9DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Benito María de Moxó y Francolí
Archbishop Benito María de Moxó y Francolí O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervera, Spain

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,221
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 92, and Page 309
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 124, Number 659

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast