Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Suárez Cázares

Auxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán

Titular Bishop of Abidda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1946 BornLa Piedad
30 Dec 197226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
1 Jun 198841.5AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
25 Jul 198841.6Ordained BishopBishop of Campeche, México
18 Aug 199447.7AppointedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
13 Dec 200660.0ResignedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
4 Nov 200861.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
4 Nov 200861.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abidda

MicroData Summary for Carlos Suárez Cázares:
Bishop Carlos Suárez Cázares (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Morelia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Morelia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 11 Nov 2013