Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herculano Medina Garfias

Auxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán

Titular Bishop of Gegi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1967 BornRincón de Cedeños
13 Aug 199527.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Morelia, Michoacán, México
15 Feb 199628.2Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
1 Dec 201548.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
1 Dec 201548.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gegi
25 Feb 201648.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gegi

MicroData Summary for Herculano Medina Garfias
Bishop Herculano Medina Garfias (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Morelia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Morelia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2015
  • od/c01: CB, 1 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 7 Dec 2015
  • c2+: CB, 25 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,848

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 3 Apr 2016