Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Villalón Mercado

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Hermiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1894Born
30 Oct 192732.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 195257.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
1 Apr 195257.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermiana
3 Aug 195257.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermiana
12 Sep 197782.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
16 Feb 198388.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for José Villalón Mercado
Bishop José Villalón Mercado (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUruapán

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast