Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gerald Emmett Cardinal Carter

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1912BornMontréal
22 May 193725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
1 Dec 196149.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada
1 Dec 196149.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Altiburus
2 Feb 196249.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altiburus
17 Feb 196451.9AppointedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
12 Mar 196452.0InstalledBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
27 Apr 197866.1AppointedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
5 Jun 197866.2InstalledArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
30 Jun 197967.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jun 197967.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
17 Mar 199078.0RetiredArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
6 Apr 200391.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gerald Emmett Carter:
Gerald Emmett Cardinal Carter (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toronto

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
  • a cardinal for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 9
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014