Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy Charbonneau, P.M.E.

Bishop of Choluteca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1946 BornMontréal, Canada
24 May 196923.4ProfessedMember of Société des Missions-Étrangères
16 May 197024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
26 Jan 201367.0AppointedBishop of Choluteca, Honduras
20 Apr 201367.3Ordained BishopBishop of Choluteca, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Guy Charbonneau:
Bishop Guy Charbonneau P.M.E. (born ) Bishop of Choluteca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Choluteca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 31 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 1 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,766

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013