Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph La Rocque

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Germanicopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1808Born
14 Mar 183526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
6 Jul 185243.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
6 Jul 185243.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
28 Oct 185244.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
22 Jun 186051.8AppointedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
3 Sep 186052.0InstalledBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
4 Feb 186657.4ResignedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
15 Jan 186758.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
18 Nov 188779.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph La Rocque
Bishop Joseph La Rocque (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Hyacinthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambly
Ordained BishopSaint-Joseph-de-Chambly, Church, Chambly
Death PlaceSaint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 81, and Page 285
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 311, and Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 43
  • obd/c1/i: CB, 18 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 19 Sep 2017