Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Édouard Jetté

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Joliette, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Tabae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1898Born
31 May 192324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Joliette, Québec, Canada
3 Jan 194849.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada
3 Jan 194849.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabae
14 Apr 194849.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabae
30 Apr 196263.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Joliette, Québec, Canada
3 Jan 196869.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Joliette, Québec, Canada
30 Jan 198889.4DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Joliette, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Édouard Jetté
Bishop Édouard Jetté (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Joliette

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Jacques-de-Montcalm

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast