Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valérien Bélanger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1902Born
29 May 192624.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 195653.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
16 Mar 195653.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
11 May 195654.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
19 Feb 198380.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Valérien Bélanger
Bishop Valérien Bélanger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLes Cèdres de Soulanges

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast