Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Réginald Duprat, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada

Titular Bishop of Tremithus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1877Born
14 Feb 190426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Mar 193860.5AppointedBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
31 May 193860.7Ordained BishopBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
29 Jun 195274.8RetiredBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
29 Jun 195274.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tremithus
13 Feb 195476.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Réginald Duprat
Bishop Réginald Duprat O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Prince-Albert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeauharnois

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast