Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Élie Anicet Latulipe

Deceased

Bishop of Haileybury, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1859BornSaint-Anicet-de-Huntingdon
30 May 188525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
1 Oct 190849.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Temiskaming, Ontario, Canada
1 Oct 190849.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cotenna
30 Nov 190849.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cotenna
31 Dec 191556.4AppointedBishop of Haileybury, Ontario, Canada
14 Dec 192263.4DiedBishop of Haileybury, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Élie Anicet Latulipe:
Bishop Élie Anicet Latulipe (born , died ) Bishop of Haileybury

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013