Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Gazaille

Bishop of Nicolet, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1946 BornMontréal
29 May 197125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
11 Feb 200659.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
11 Feb 200659.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
25 Mar 200659.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaga
11 Jul 201165.2AppointedBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
11 Sep 201165.3InstalledBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for André Gazaille:
Bishop André Gazaille (born ) Bishop of Nicolet

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nicolet.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2006
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,100
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2011
  • i: CB, 13 Aug 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Sep 2014