Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Antonelli Lamarche

Deceased

Bishop of Chicoutimi, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1870BornSaint-Roch de l`Achigan
16 Jul 189322.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 192857.8AppointedBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
18 Oct 192858.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
29 Jan 194069.3DiedBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Charles-Antonelli Lamarche:
Bishop Charles-Antonelli Lamarche (born , died ) Bishop of Chicoutimi

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013