Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Charles Prince

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1804BornSt-Grégoire
23 Sep 182622.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 184440.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
5 Jul 184440.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
25 Jul 184541.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
8 Jun 185248.3AppointedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
3 Nov 185248.7InstalledBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
5 May 186056.2DiedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Charles Prince:
Bishop John Charles Prince (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 311
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 253, and Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013