Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Louis-Zéphirin Moreau

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1824Born
19 Dec 184622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
19 Nov 187551.6AppointedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
16 Jan 187651.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
24 May 190177.1DiedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
10 May 1987Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Louis-Zéphirin Moreau (VIAF: 35518287)
Bishop Bl. Louis-Zéphirin Moreau (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBécancour, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Death PlaceSaint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 3
  • opd/c1: CB, 18 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 19 Sep 2017