Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emile Yelle, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

Titular Archbishop of Arcadiopolis in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1893Born
15 Jul 191724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
21 Jul 193340.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
21 Jul 193340.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Arcadiopolis in Europa
21 Sep 193340.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Arcadiopolis in Europa
24 May 194148.1ResignedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
21 Dec 194754.7DiedCoadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Emile Yelle (VIAF: 89485067)
Archbishop Emile Yelle P.S.S. (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Boniface

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Rémi-de-Napierville

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast