Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Charles-François-Calixte Morisson

Deceased

Priest of Montréal, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1819Born
16 Oct 184223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
22 Dec 186243.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vancouver Island, USA
22 Dec 186243.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
1863¹43.2ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Vancouver Island, USA
1863¹43.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Coronea
2 Apr 1877²57.5DiedPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-François-Calixte Morisson
Father Charles-François-Calixte Morisson (born , died ) Priest of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerthierville, Diocese of Montréal, Québec
Death PlaceSaint-Cyprien de Napierville, Archdiocese of Québec

  • a priest for 34.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017