Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles Lussier

Bishop Emeritus of Joliette, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1940 Born
19 Dec 196424.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 198848.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
23 Dec 198848.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Augurus
28 Feb 198948.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augurus
7 Sep 199151.2AppointedBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada
17 Oct 199151.3InstalledBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada
8 Sep 201575.2RetiredBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gilles Lussier
Bishop Gilles Lussier (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Joliette

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Joliette.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,344
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast