Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Patrick Whelan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec

Titular Bishop of Opus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1899BornMontréal
19 Dec 192526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
28 Jun 194141.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
28 Jun 194141.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Opus
15 Aug 194141.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Opus
4 Oct 198081.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Patrick Whelan:
Bishop Lawrence Patrick Whelan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013