Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ottawa

Archidioecesis Ottaviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 8 June 1886
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Ontario
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 5,818 (2,247 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ontario
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: O
  • Official Web Site: http://archottawa.ca/
  • Mailing Address: 1247 Place Kilborn, Ottawa, Ont. K1H 6K9, Canada
  • Telephone: (613)738-5025
  • Fax: 738-0130

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Bytown
25 June 1847ErectedDiocese of Kingston
Diocese of Montréal
Diocese of Bytown (erected)
Diocese of Ottawa
14 June 1860Name ChangedDiocese of Bytown Diocese of Ottawa
11 July 1882Territory LostDiocese of Ottawa
Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface
Diocese of Trois Rivières
Vicariate Apostolic of Pontiac (erected)
Archdiocese of Ottawa
8 June 1886ElevatedDiocese of Ottawa Archdiocese of Ottawa
21 April 1913Territory LostArchdiocese of Ottawa Diocese of Mont-Laurier (erected)
23 June 1951Territory LostDiocese of Mont-Laurier
Archdiocese of Montréal
Archdiocese of Ottawa
Diocese of Saint-Jérôme (erected)
27 April 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Ottawa Diocese of Hull (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Ottawa
1950241,000380,00063.4%2734166893491,1181,942132ap1951
1966210,455360,00058.5%2043565603754951,630105ap1967
1970199,985249,53080.1%1964706663006801,63498ap1971
1976261,545516,94550.6%17227144359014091,375100ap1977
1980285,900575,00049.7%16625442068093931,252100ap1981
1990350,000677,00051.7%149222371943133261,047112ap1991
1999402,305805,61049.9%1621793411,17940233886113ap2000
2000402,305805,61049.9%1671673341,20449215871113ap2001
2001402,305805,61049.9%1721753471,15947217859113ap2002
2002402,305812,30549.5%1621022641,52350149830113ap2003
2003402,305812,30549.5%1701022721,47951142848113ap2004
2004392,635812,30548.3%1771022791,40760147848111ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014