Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Maurice Choquet, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien

Titular Bishop of Diospolis Inferior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1920BornMontréal, Canada
24 Jun 194423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
6 Jun 195938.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
6 Jun 195938.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Diospolis Inferior
15 Sep 195939.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diospolis Inferior
11 Aug 196746.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
15 Nov 199676.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Paul-Maurice Choquet:
Bishop Paul-Maurice Choquet C.S.C. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013