Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Alphonsus O’Connor

Deceased

Bishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1838Born
2 Aug 186123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
11 Jan 188950.9AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
1 May 188951.3Ordained BishopBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
23 Jan 191375.0DiedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Richard Alphonsus O’Connor (VIAF: 317273977)
Bishop Richard Alphonsus O’Connor (born , died ) Bishop of Peterborough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceListowell, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
Ordained BishopPeterborough, Diocese of Peterborough, Ontario

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 448
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017