Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Émilien Frenette

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1905Born
30 May 193126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
5 Jul 195146.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
12 Sep 195146.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
11 Jun 197166.0ResignedBishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
3 Mar 198377.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Émilien Frenette
Bishop Émilien Frenette (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Jérôme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast