Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Terrence Thomas Prendergast, S.J.

Archbishop of Ottawa, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1944 BornMontréal
15 Aug 196319.5ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
10 Jun 197228.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Feb 199551.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
22 Feb 199551.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Slebte
25 Apr 199551.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Slebte
30 Jun 199854.4AppointedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
14 Sep 199854.6InstalledArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
22 Jan 200257.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
14 May 200763.2AppointedArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
26 Jun 200763.4InstalledArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Terrence Thomas Prendergast:
Archbishop Terrence Thomas Prendergast S.J. (born ) Archbishop of Ottawa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ottawa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 May 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,508

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014