Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Wilfrid Guy, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan

Titular Bishop of Photice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1883BornMontréal
9 Jun 190622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Dec 192946.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Grouard, Alberta, Canada
19 Dec 192946.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Photice
1 May 193046.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Photice
2 Jun 193753.8AppointedBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
25 Oct 193754.2InstalledBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
7 Nov 194259.3ResignedBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
7 Nov 194259.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Photice
8 Dec 195168.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Wilfrid Guy:
Bishop Joseph-Wilfrid Guy O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gravelbourg

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013