Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Médard Émard

Deceased

Archbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1853Born
10 Jun 187623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
5 Apr 189239.0AppointedBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
9 Jun 189239.1Ordained BishopBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
2 Jun 192269.1AppointedArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
28 Mar 192773.9DiedArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Médard Émard (VIAF: 66002524)
Archbishop Joseph-Médard Émard (born , died ) Archbishop of Ottawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Constant-de-la-Prairie
Ordained BishopValleyfield, Diocese of Valleyfield, Québec

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017