Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Joseph-Honoré Lajeunesse, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Keewatin, Manitoba, Canada

Titular Bishop of Bonusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1890Born
11 Apr 192029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
25 Apr 193342.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Keewatin, Manitoba, Canada
25 Apr 193342.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bonusta
29 Jun 193342.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bonusta
26 Nov 193343.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Keewatin, Manitoba, Canada
15 Apr 195463.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Keewatin, Manitoba, Canada
10 Jul 196170.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Keewatin, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Martin Joseph-Honoré Lajeunesse
Bishop Martin Joseph-Honoré Lajeunesse O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Keewatin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Marguerite-du-Lac Masson

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018