Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert-Olivier Chalifoux

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1850Born
10 Jan 187524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
30 Sep 191464.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
30 Sep 191464.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
29 Dec 191464.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
17 Mar 192271.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Hubert-Olivier Chalifoux
Bishop Hubert-Olivier Chalifoux (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sherbrooke

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Hyacinthe

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 72
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast