Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theophilus Mayer, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Madras, India

Titular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1850Born
3 Dec 187626.3Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
31 Jul 189443.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madras, India
31 Jul 189443.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
4 Nov 189444.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
9 Sep 190050.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Madras, India

MicroData Summary for Theophilus Mayer
Bishop Theophilus Mayer M.H.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Madras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontreal, Diocese of Montréal, Québec, Canada
Ordained BishopSte Marie des Anges, Cathedral, Madras, Archdiocese of Madras

  • a priest for 23.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 117
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017