Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain Faubert

Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec

Titular Bishop of Vicus Pacati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1965 BornMontréal
9 Jun 199530.1Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
19 Apr 201651.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
19 Apr 201651.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Pacati
15 Jun 201651.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Pacati

MicroData Summary for Alain Faubert
Bishop Alain Faubert (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Montréal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 25 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 7 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Jun 2016