Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Guillaume-Laurent Forbes

Deceased

Archbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1865Born
17 Mar 188822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
6 Aug 191347.9AppointedBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada
9 Oct 191348.1Ordained BishopBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada
29 Jan 192862.4AppointedArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
22 May 194074.7DiedArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Guillaume-Laurent Forbes
Archbishop Joseph-Guillaume-Laurent Forbes (born , died ) Archbishop of Ottawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIle-Perrot

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018