Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Arthur Papineau

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Joliette, Québec

Titular Bishop of Simitthu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1875BornSaint-Jean-d'Iberville
29 Jun 190025.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 192853.4AppointedBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada
24 Aug 192853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada
3 Jan 196892.9RetiredBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada
3 Jan 196892.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Simitthu
15 Feb 197095.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Joliette, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Arthur Papineau:
Bishop Joseph Arthur Papineau (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Joliette

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013