Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Philip Adélard Langevin, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1855Born
30 Jul 188226.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Jan 189539.3AppointedArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
19 Mar 189539.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
15 Jun 191559.8DiedArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Louis Philip Adélard Langevin (VIAF: 44291355)
Archbishop Louis Philip Adélard Langevin O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint-Boniface

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Isidore-de-Laprairie, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopSaint-Boniface, Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 152
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017