Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Ernest-Anastase Forget

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Québec, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1885Born
29 Jun 191024.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 193448.8AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Québec, Québec, Canada
29 Jun 193448.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Québec, Québec, Canada
3 Feb 195569.5DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Québec, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Paul-Ernest-Anastase Forget
Bishop Paul-Ernest-Anastase Forget (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-François-de-Sales

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast