Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignace Bourget

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montréal, Québec

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1799BornSt-Joseph de Pointe-Lévis
30 Nov 182223.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 183737.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
10 Mar 183737.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
25 Jul 183737.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
19 Apr 184040.5SucceededBishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
11 May 187676.5RetiredBishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
4 Jul 187676.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
7 Jun 188585.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Ignace Bourget:
Archbishop Ignace Bourget (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montréal

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 366
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 253, and Page 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013