Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Léo Deschâtelets, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Oblates of Mary Immaculate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1899Born
13 May 191920.1ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Mar 192223.0Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
9 Jun 192526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
2 May 194748.1AppointedSuperior General of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
5 May 197273.1ResignedSuperior General of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1 Nov 197475.6DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Oblates of Mary Immaculate

MicroData Summary for Léo Deschâtelets
Father Léo Deschâtelets O.M.I. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Oblates of Mary Immaculate

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Canada

  • a priest for 49.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018