Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Alfred Archambault

Deceased

Bishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1859Born
29 Jun 188223.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 190445.0AppointedBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada
24 Aug 190445.2Ordained BishopBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada
25 Apr 191353.9DiedBishop of Joliette, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Alfred Archambault
Bishop Joseph Alfred Archambault (born , died ) Bishop of Joliette

EventPlace
Birth PlaceL'Assomption

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast