Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Harris

Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1944 BornMontréal
24 May 196924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
26 Oct 200258.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
26 Oct 200258.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Trofimiana
12 Dec 200258.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trofimiana
8 May 200762.6AppointedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
15 Jun 200762.7InstalledBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Robert Harris:
Bishop Robert Harris (born ) Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 May 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,291

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013