Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Oscar Julien, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nyassa

Titular Bishop of Choba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1886BornSaint-Timothée, Canada
29 Jun 191225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
10 Dec 193447.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nyassa, Malawi
10 Dec 193447.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Choba
24 Mar 193548.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Choba
7 Dec 195063.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Nyassa, Malawi
5 Mar 196174.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nyassa, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Joseph Oscar Julien:
Bishop Joseph Oscar Julien M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nyassa

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015