Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Emmanuel Deschamps

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Thennesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1874Born
23 Dec 189925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
6 Feb 192550.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
6 Feb 192550.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thennesus
21 Apr 192550.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thennesus
23 Jun 194065.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Emmanuel Deschamps
Bishop Alphonse Emmanuel Deschamps (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Geneviève-de-Jacques Cartier

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018