Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Gauthier

Deceased

Archbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1871Born
29 Sep 189422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
28 Jun 191240.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
28 Jun 191240.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Arabia
24 Aug 191240.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Arabia
18 Oct 192150.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Montréal, Québec, Canada
5 Apr 192351.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
5 Apr 192351.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tharona
20 Sep 193967.9SucceededArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
31 Aug 194068.8DiedArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Georges Gauthier
Archbishop Georges Gauthier (born , died ) Archbishop of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Buried Place (Original)Mary, Queen of the World, Cathedral, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 56
  • c1: CB, 18 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast