Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques Lartigue, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montréal, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1777BornMontréal
21 Sep 180023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
1 Feb 182042.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
1 Feb 182042.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
21 Jan 182143.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
13 May 183658.9AppointedBishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
19 Apr 184062.8DiedBishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques Lartigue:
Bishop Jean-Jacques Lartigue P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Montréal

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 253, and Page 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013