Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface

Archidioecesis Sancti Bonifacii



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Albert LeGatt, Archbishop
  • Émilius Goulet, P.S.S., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

(none)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 22 September 1871
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Manitoba
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 38,000 (14,677 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: SB
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archsaintboniface.ca/
  • Mailing Address: 151 Avenue de la Cathédrale, Saint-Boniface, MB R2H 0H6, Canada
  • Telephone: (204)237-9851
  • Fax: 231-2652

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of North-West (Nord-Ouest)
16 April 1844ErectedArchdiocese of Québec Vicariate Apostolic of North-West (Nord-Ouest) (erected)
Diocese of Saint-Boniface
4 June 1847ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of North-West (Nord-Ouest) Diocese of Saint-Boniface
8 April 1862Territory LostDiocese of Saint-Boniface Vicariate Apostolic of Athabaska Mackenzie (erected)
22 September 1871Territory LostDiocese of Saint-Boniface Diocese of Saint Albert (erected)
Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface
22 September 1871ElevatedDiocese of Saint-Boniface Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface
11 July 1882Territory LostDiocese of Ottawa
Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface
Diocese of Trois Rivières
Vicariate Apostolic of Pontiac (erected)
4 June 1891Territory LostArchdiocese of Saint-Boniface Vicariate Apostolic of Saskatchewan (erected)
4 March 1910Territory LostArchdiocese of Saint-Boniface Diocese of Regina (erected)
4 December 1915Territory LostArchdiocese of Saint-Boniface Archdiocese of Winnipeg (erected)
29 April 1952Territory LostDiocese of Sault Sainte Marie
Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface
Diocese of Fort William (erected)
13 July 1967Territory AddedArchdiocese of Saint-Boniface (Archdiocese without Suffragans)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface
191087,8169567162542ce
195065,085297,00021.9%8412821230719971580ap1951
196671,176293,42824.3%11611322931018169269ap1967
196878,367300,00026.1%937917245513468760ap1971
197677,771303,70825.6%776314055510466670ap1977
198080,700353,00022.9%8077157514411660572ap1981
199082,000373,00022.0%7670146561911047870ap1991
1999101,920365,00027.9%6554119856136440277ap2000
2000101,920365,00027.9%6556121842146934278ap2001
2001101,920365,00027.9%6560125815137332978ap2002
2002101,920365,00027.9%6853121842136433078ap2003
2003102,000365,00027.9%7048118864126132976ap2004
2004113,495416,68927.2%6648114995118628076ap2005
2010113,495445,00025.5%8348131866206023077ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.4, 30 Dec 2012; data: 30 Dec 2012