Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Luigi Cardinal Ciappi, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Ges¨ agonizzante a Vitinia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1909BornFirenze, Italy
8 Oct 192617.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Mar 193222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Jun 197767.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Misenum
18 Jun 197767.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Misenum
27 Jun 197767.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore
27 Jun 197767.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 198777.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Ges¨ agonizzante a Vitinia
23 Apr 199686.5DiedCardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Ges¨ agonizzante a Vitinia

MicroData Summary for Mario Luigi Ciappi:
Cardinal Mario Luigi Ciappi O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Ges¨ agonizzante a Vitinia

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
  • a cardinal for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013