Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Joseph Cardinal Carberry

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Louis, Missouri

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista de’ Rossi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1904BornBrooklyn, NY
28 Jul 192925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
3 May 195651.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
3 May 195651.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Elis
25 Jul 195652.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elis
22 Aug 195652.1InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
20 Nov 195753.3SucceededBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
16 Jan 196560.5AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
25 Mar 196560.7InstalledBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
17 Feb 196863.5AppointedArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
25 Mar 196863.7InstalledArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
28 Apr 196964.7Elevated to Cardinal
30 Apr 196964.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista de’ Rossi
31 Jul 197975.0RetiredArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
17 Jun 199893.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Carberry:
Cardinal John Joseph Carberry (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Louis

  • a priest for 68.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
  • a cardinal for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 66
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 15 Jan 2014