Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frank Henry Greteman

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sioux City, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1907Born
8 Dec 193224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
14 Apr 196557.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
14 Apr 196557.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
26 May 196557.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
15 Oct 197062.8AppointedBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
17 Aug 198375.6RetiredBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
21 Mar 198779.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Sioux City, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Frank Henry Greteman
Bishop Frank Henry Greteman (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sioux City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilley
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast