Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Austria



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Stephan Zurbriggen, Apostolic Nuncio
  • Giorgio Zur, Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Name Changed: 6 August 1806
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Austria
  • Official Web Site: http://www.nuntiatur.at/
  • Mailing Address: Theresianumgasse, 31, A-1040 Wien, Austria
  • Telephone: (43-1)505.13.27
  • Fax: 505.61.40

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Nunciature to Emperor
Nunciature to Austria
6 August 1806Name ChangedNunciature to Emperor Nunciature to Austria
9 August 1946RestoredNunciature to Austria (as Internunciature)
21 December 1951ElevatedNunciature to Austria (to Nunciature)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast