Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Pietropaoli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trivento

Titular Archbishop of Chalcis in Graecia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1857BornRocca di Cambio
22 May 188023.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 189740.1AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
25 Apr 189740.1Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
29 Apr 191356.1ResignedBishop of Trivento, Italy
29 Apr 191356.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcis in Graecia
23 May 191356.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
Feb 1918³60.9ResignedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
29 Jun 192265.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Trivento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Pietropaoli:
Archbishop Carlo Pietropaoli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trivento

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 567

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013