Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Marseille

Archidioecesis Massiliensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jean-Marc Noël Aveline, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Georges Paul Pontier, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 31 January 1948
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 650 (251 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Provence-Méditerranée
  • Official Web Site: https://marseille.catholique.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Archevêché, 14 Place du Colonel Edon, 13284 Marseille CEDEX 07, France
  • Telephone: 4.91.52.38.23
  • Fax: 4.91.52.45.19

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Marseille
1st CenturyErectedDiocese of Marseille (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedArchdiocese of Arles (suppressed)
Diocese of Fréjus (suppressed)
Diocese of Marseille (suppressed)
Diocese of Toulon (suppressed)
Archdiocese of Aix
Diocese of Marseille
6 October 1822RestoredArchdiocese of Aix Diocese of Marseille
Archdiocese of Marseille
31 January 1948ElevatedDiocese of Marseille Archdiocese of Marseille
8 December 2002ElevatedArchdiocese of Marseille (became a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Marseille
1950900,000.0%32122054103001,275110ap1951
1970900,0001,000,00090.0%3143142,8661,300123ap1971
1980709,0001,052,00067.4%2962665621,26133191,450124ap1981
1990679,0001,015,00066.9%2401754151,636102491,052124ap1991
1999669,0001,000,00066.9%1911503411,96115209781122ap2000
2000661,000988,72366.9%1721503222,05219209778122ap2001
2001650,000988,72565.7%1731503232,01221209776122ap2002
2002650,000988,72365.7%1731483212,02420206745122ap2003
2003650,000988,72365.7%1711483192,03719177602122ap2004
2004700,000988,72370.8%1651483132,23621183599122ap2005
2013715,0001,048,52168.2%154902442,93026111428122ap2014
2016723,0251,055,98068.5%1331002333,10325125375119ap2017
2019739,9301,080,79568.5%133882213,34826118357110ap2020
2021741,0001,082,30068.5%130852153,44626125302110ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Marseille
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 329, and Page 330
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 187
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 237, and Page 238
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 234
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 260
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 280
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 573, to Page 575
  • Archdiocese of Marseille
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 40, Page 309, to Page 311
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
    Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 4 Oct 2023