Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guido Cardinal Del Mestri

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1911BornBanja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
11 Apr 193625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
3 Oct 195948.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to British Eastern and Western Africa
23 Sep 196049.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Eastern Africa
28 Oct 196150.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tuscamia
31 Dec 196150.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tuscamia
27 Oct 196554.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Kenya
9 Sep 196756.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
20 Jun 197059.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Canada
12 Aug 197564.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
3 Aug 198473.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
28 Jun 199180.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
28 Jun 199180.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 Aug 199382.5DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

MicroData Summary for Guido Del Mestri
Guido Cardinal Del Mestri (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Germany

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab/pnun/xxke: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 57, Page 1,023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016